judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REDCO CONSTRUCTION, a Wyoming Corporation v. PROFILE PROPERTIES, LLC, a Wyoming LLC

Case Heading (S-10-0255)
Case Number:S-10-0255Case Docketed On:12/06/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:REDCO CONSTRUCTION, a Wyoming Corporation v. PROFILE PROPERTIES, LLC, a Wyoming LLC
Full Title:REDCO CONSTRUCTION, a Wyoming Corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. PROFILE PROPERTIES, LLC, a Wyoming LLC, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRedco Construction, a Wyoming CorporationJustin Victor Kallal
AppelleeProfile Properties, LLC, a Wyoming LLCRaymond W. Martin

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Liens
Opinion Number:2012 WY 24
Citation:271 P.3d 408

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/06/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/06/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/24/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's appeal brief; and statement of costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Profile Properties, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/22/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/23/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/01/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Raymond Martin for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin Kallal for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/25/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Justin Victor Kallal for appellant; Raymond W. Martin for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/25/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/23/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/29/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
02/29/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion for costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/21/2012Order - Awarding costsOrderAwarding costsFinal
03/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/22/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/22/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/22/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/27/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/26/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal