judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO., ET AL V. ANTONIO E. WINGO

Case Information: 10-CV-1512
Short Caption:WHITING TURNER CONTRACTING CO., ET AL V. ANTONIO E. WINGOClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6098-07Filed Date:11/24/2010

Opening Event Date:11/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/02/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/10/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/04/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/03/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWhiting Turner Contracting CompanyN
Timothy E. Fizer YN
AppellantDistrict of Columbia Water & Sewer AuthorityN
O'Neil S. KingNY
AppelleeAntonio E. Wingo N
Charles C. ParsonsYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 24, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellants shall, within 20 daysfrom the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
01/10/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
01/10/2011RECEIVED- aplt's statement regarding transcripts
01/13/2011 On consideration of appellants' motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, to which no opposition has been filed, and itappearing that transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellants' motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is (MORE)
01/13/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/20/09, 1/5/10, 4/14/10, 10/18-20/10, 10/21,25 &26/10) (elp)
01/13/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior court, the record index and transcripts required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (41-pgs/tape 11/20/09 proc.)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (67-pgs/tape 1/5/10 proc.)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (85-pgs/tape 4/14/10 proc)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (242-pgs/price 10/18/10 proc.)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (213-pgs/price 10/19/10 proc.)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#6 (225-pgs/price 10/20/10 proc.)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#7 (166-pgs/lindsay 10/21/10 proc.)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#8 (198-pgs/lindsay 10/25/10 proc.)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (149-pgs/lindsay 10/26/10 proc.)w/cd
03/02/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/08/2011RECORD INDEX
04/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 5/6/11 joint
04/18/2011 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file a joint brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' joint brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before May 6, 2011. (JAC) elp
05/06/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Whiting Turner Contracting Company & District of Columbia Water & Sewer Authority) (elp)
05/06/2011APPENDIX - (JOINT) (elp)
06/06/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 6/10/11
06/07/2011RECEIVED- aple's brief
06/10/2011 On consideration of appellee's consent motion for an extension of time to file the brief, and the lodged brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellee is filed. It is (MORE)
06/10/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/10/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC) elp
06/10/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/16/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
06/30/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/05/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF to 7/20/11. (joint) no oppo
07/08/2011 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for an extension of time to file a joint reply brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the appellant's joint reply brief shall be filed on or before July 20, 2011. (JAC) elp
07/20/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant District of Columbia Water & Sewer Authority, Appellant Whiting Turner Contracting Company)
11/30/2011WithdrawnACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/06/2011FiledMotion To Postpone/Continue Argument (Appellee)
12/15/2011FiledOrder Granting aple's motion to reschedule oral argument.
02/09/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/05/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
04/04/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Pryor Timothy E. Fizer, Esq. for appellant O'Neil S. King, Esq. for appellant Charles C. Parsons, Esq. for appellee
07/11/2012FiledMotion notifying the court of a relevant appellate decision (Appellee)
07/12/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge)
08/03/2012FiledMandate