judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00139-CR
10-81-00139-CR
10/01/1981
Murder
Carl Lundberg
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/18/1983Case returned from higher court
04/18/1983Mandate issued by this Court
12/02/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/22/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/18/2083Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
263896
30 Years