judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00105-CV
08-81-00105-CV
09/30/1981
Automobile Personal Injury
Orkin Exterminating Company, Inc.
Kennon Ramage and Thomas Ramage
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
09/16/1983Mandate Issued
08/26/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
05/05/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/29/1983No description available.
04/29/1983No description available.
03/30/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/28/1983Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry
03/17/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/02/1983Opinion issuedAff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct
03/02/1983Opinion issuedAff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct
03/02/1983Opinion issuedAff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct
10/08/1982Submitted
10/08/1982Submission
10/08/1982Submitted
08/18/1982Submission
02/12/1982Brief Filed
02/12/1982Case ready to be set
02/10/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/28/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/08/1982Brief Filed
12/30/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/30/1981Statement of Facts Filed
10/14/1981Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/01/1981Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
09/30/1981Transcript Filed
09/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
65th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Edward Marquez
79-5583