judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00142-CR
10-81-00142-CR
10/01/1981
Injury to a Child, Elderly or Disabled Individual
Alice McKnight
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/07/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/20/1983Case stored
01/20/1983Mandate issued by this Court
11/18/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/16/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
293372
10 Years