judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00688-CR
14-81-00688-CR
09/30/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Renz, Charles Robert
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/16/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
05/16/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
01/21/1983No description available.
08/19/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/22/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/22/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/01/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
09/30/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
09/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable FRANK WILLIAM PRICE
331,406
30 years