judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-81-00041-CV
11-81-00041-CV
10/01/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Childress, Harry et al
Dairyland County Mutual Insurance Company
No
8th Court of Appeals
01/30/1981
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/1983Mandate issued
05/25/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/09/1983Application for writ of error disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/02/1982Case forwarded to higher court
08/30/1982Application for writ of error
08/30/1982Express fee paid
08/30/1982Application fee paid
09/28/1981Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
09/04/1981Supp. TR filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/16/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
162nd District Court
Dallas
78-9234-I