judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00135-CR
10-81-00135-CR
10/01/1981
Attempted Manslaughter
David Lee Merida
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/07/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
03/17/1983Case stored
03/17/1983Mandate issued by this Court
10/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/16/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
279241
5 Years