judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00127-CR
10-81-00127-CR
10/01/1981
Poss of a Firearm by Felon
Robert Allan Curry
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/04/1982Case stored
08/04/1982Mandate issued by this Court
06/03/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/20/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
304260
8 Years