judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARNER VS. KRAMER

Case Information: 33498
Short Caption:BARNER VS. KRAMERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9801074AClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/09/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/21/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/21/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00456
06/17/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-05263
11/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 20 days. Failure to transmit a timely record on appeal without sufficient excuse may result in sanctions. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-10757
11/05/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-10908
11/05/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 19, 1999, this court received appellant's opening biref. We direct the clerk of this court fo file the brief received on February 19, 1999; however, we note appellant has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person, and appellant may not file further documents without leave of this court.Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief. 00-05586
04/06/2000BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. 99-01137
05/08/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/8/00. 00-07628
05/09/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/13/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent: Solicitor General Drennan A. Clark. 01-04508
05/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file documents in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have received and considered appellant's proper person documents. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-08435
06/11/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08543
06/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/14/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 12, 2002. 02-08543