judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

POWDER RIVER BASIN RESOURCE COUNCIL and SIERRA CLUB v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, and BASIN ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE

Case Heading (S-09-0037)
Case Number:S-09-0037Case Docketed On:02/26/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Public Health and Safety (Title 35)
Short Title:POWDER RIVER BASIN RESOURCE COUNCIL and SIERRA CLUB v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, and BASIN ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE
Full Title:POWDER RIVER BASIN RESOURCE COUNCIL and SIERRA CLUB, Appellants (Petitioners), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, and BASIN ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPowder River Basin Resource CouncilJames Stuart Angell
Robin L. Cooley
AppellantSierra ClubJames Stuart Angell
Robin L. Cooley
AppelleeDepartment of Environmental QualityBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
Nancy Elizabeth Vehr
Lucas James Esch
AppelleeBasin Electric Power CooperativePatrick Reed Day
Mark Richard Ruppert
Other Particpants
Amicus curiaeNorthern Cheyenne TribeJohn C. Schumacher
Brian C. Gruber

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Natural Resources
Opinion Number:2010 WY 25
Citation:226 P.3d 809 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/26/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/26/2009Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
02/26/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/10/2009Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
04/20/2009Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
04/20/2009Order - Pro hac vice - allowing admission of Robin L. Cooley as counsel for appellants.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
04/27/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/30/2009Motion - Correct a DocumentMotionCorrect a DocumentFinal
05/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Unopposed motion to file corrected appellants' brief; and received copy of proposed brief; and proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/01/2009Order - Granting unopposed motion to file corrected appellants' brief.OrderGrantFinal
05/04/2009Brief - Replacement - Corrected Appellants' Brief (Replaces appellants' brief filed 4-27-09)BriefReplacementFinal
05/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Corrected Appellants' Brief (Replacement)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/08/2009Motion - Amicus - leave to participateMotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
05/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by John Schumacher on behalf of Amicis CuriaeNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/27/2009Motion - Admission pro hac vice for Brian C. Gruber to appear on behalf of Amicus CuriaeMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
05/27/2009Affidavit - Other - In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceAffidavitOtherFinal
05/27/2009Order - Pro hac vice - allowing admission of Brian C. Gruber on behalf of Amicus CuriaeOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
05/27/2009Order - Amicus - grant participationOrderAmicus - grant participationFinal
05/27/2009Brief - Amicus curiae Northern Cheyenne TribeBriefAmicus curiaeFinal
06/15/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Basin Electric Power Cooperative and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/15/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - Appellee State of WyomingNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Brief (State of Wyoming)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/02/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Day for appellee Basin Electric.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Robin L. Cooley for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/16/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Agency Record (two boxes containing 24 volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Nancy Vehr for appellee DEQ.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
08/07/2009Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/13/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Robin L. Cooley for appellants; Nancy Elizabeth Vehr, Senior Assistant Attorney General, and Patrick Reed Day for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/13/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
09/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/02/2009Order - Sanction - otherOrderSanction - otherFinal
10/08/2009Fees - Sanctions received - otherFeesSanctions received - otherFinal
10/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
10/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
12/08/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Additional authorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
12/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Joint Notice of Additional Authority and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/05/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/23/2010Record - Record returned to agency (2 boxes of Wyoming Environment Quality Counsel record)RecordRecord returned to agencyFinal
03/23/2010Record - Record returned to district court (one volume, original papers)RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/25/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/24/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal