judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00126-CR
10-81-00126-CR
10/01/1981
Burglary of a Habitation
Willie Cleven Tottenham and Albert Tyrone Bernard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/16/1983Case stored
03/16/1983Mandate issued by this Court
12/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/22/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/16/2083Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court
Galveston
36317
30 Years (each)