judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00120-CR
10-81-00120-CR
10/01/1981
Manslaughter
Jack Grayson Johnson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/1983Case stored
01/10/1983Mandate issued by this Court
09/23/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/16/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2083Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
174th District Court
Harris
305519
Life