judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00119-CR
10-81-00119-CR
10/01/1981
Obscenity
Carl Lee Davis
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/30/2009Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/04/1983Case stored
11/04/1983Mandate issued by this Court
07/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/01/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/30/2009Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 3
Harris
589427
3 Days + $750 Fine