judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00121-CR
10-81-00121-CR
10/01/1981
Sexual Assault
Christopher Mayfield
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/07/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/27/1983Case stored
01/27/1983Mandate issued by this Court
05/13/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/29/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
308052
10 Years