judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00114-CR
10-81-00114-CR
10/01/1981
Sexual Assault
Dominic Corriera
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/26/1983Case stored
05/26/1983Mandate issued by this Court
01/13/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/22/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
305680
15 Years + 1 Day