judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00115-CR
10-81-00115-CR
10/01/1981
Poss With Intent to Deliver Cocaine
Donald Kahle Monroe
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/22/1982Case stored
12/22/1982Mandate issued by this Court
10/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/16/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
304728
10 Years (Probated)