judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00132-CR
10-81-00132-CR
10/01/1981
Aggravated Robbery
Robert Earl House
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/10/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/17/1982Case stored
11/17/1982Mandate issued by this Court
09/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/09/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/10/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
314052
15 Years