judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JACQUELINE T. ROBINSON-REEDER V. AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1524
Short Caption:JACQUELINE T. ROBINSON-REEDER V. AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5798-10Filed Date:12/03/2010

Opening Event Date:12/03/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/06/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/03/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJacqueline T. Robinson-Reeder NPro SeN
AppelleeAmerican Council on EducationN
Christine N. Kearns YN
AppelleeColeen Collins N
Christine N. Kearns YN
AppelleeAltowese Mclendon N
Christine N. Kearns YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/03/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 3, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
01/18/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 15, 2010, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript, within 20 days, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
01/18/2011DISMISSED
01/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL (opp) (elp)
02/11/2011RECEIVED#1 (9-pgs/tape 11/5/10 proc.)w/cd
02/22/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion to reinstate appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged request for transcripts, construed as the statement regarding transcript, and it appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and this appeal is hereby reinstated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the lodged Statement Regarding Transcript. It is (MORE)
02/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/5/10)
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (9-pgs/tape/11/5/10 proc.) w/cd
02/22/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW) elp
03/07/2011RECORD INDEX
04/05/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/05/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
05/09/2011APPELLEES' BRIEF
05/09/2011APPENDIX - Appellees' Supplemental
05/09/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
06/15/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Reply Brief (requires MOLV to file out of time - submitted with an Original and 3 copies - returned to appellant by mail)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
06/27/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Reply Brief
07/08/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged reply brief of appellant is filed. (JAC) elp
07/08/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/28/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument for 15 Minutes (Appellant)Denied
12/05/2011FiledOrder Denying pro se request for oral argument.
12/06/2011FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Oberly,Pryor
01/12/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
02/03/2012FiledMandate