judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALEXANDER (THADDEUS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30417
Short Caption:ALEXANDER (THADDEUS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C134780Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/04/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/14/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
05/14/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
06/04/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
06/12/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
06/19/1997Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings.
07/23/1997TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified copy of Transcripts (3) dated: February 7, 1997; February 10, 1997; February 11, 1997. Court Recorder: Robert H. Mintun.
09/19/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark).
09/19/1997AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark).
10/21/1997BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark.)
02/04/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
02/04/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. We conclude that the erroneous instruction in this case rendered the jury's verdict unreliable. "Appellant's conviction is reversed and the matter is remanded to the district court for further proceedings." SNP00A-1-RR/CY/NB 00-21555
01/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21793
01/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2001. 00-21793