judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

LLOYD R. BLUME AND LOWELL R. BLUME, LAWRENCE CHAMPION, DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY, ET AL. v. NATIONAL HOMES CORPORATION

Case: B-1240
B-1240
12/10/1968
Application for Writ of Error
LLOYD R. BLUME AND LOWELL R. BLUME, LAWRENCE CHAMPION, DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY, ET AL.
NATIONAL HOMES CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/19/1969Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/15/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/14/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/30/1969Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/27/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
12/10/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/19/1969Brief in Support of Petition
05/15/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/14/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/30/1969Opinion issued
01/30/1969Brief on the Merits
01/15/1969Document received (See Remarks)
01/15/1969Document received (See Remarks)
01/15/1969Document received (See Remarks)
01/15/1969Document received (See Remarks)
12/27/1968Response to Petition
12/10/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/10/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
National Homes CorporationRespondent
Lawrence Champion, dba Champion Mortgage Company, et al.Petitioner
Lloyd R. Blume and Lowell R. BlumePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information