judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAMOS (JUAN) VS. STATE C/W 33072, 34475, 34840

Case Information: 33519
Short Caption:RAMOS (JUAN) VS. STATE C/W 33072, 34475, 34840Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 33072 *, 33519, 34475 , 34840 Related Case(s): 33072 , 34475 , 34840
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C138615Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/28/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00526
01/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm these orders of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 33072 c/w 33519, 34475, 34840. 01-00732
02/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00808
02/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2001. 01-00808