judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAROL J. MIDDLEMASS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-11-0007)
Case Number:S-11-0007Case Docketed On:01/07/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:CAROL J. MIDDLEMASS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:CAROL J. MIDDLEMASS, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCarol J. MiddlemassMatthew David Winslow
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 118
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/07/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/07/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in the District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
02/22/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's brief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/25/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/30/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/13/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/19/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/11/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/25/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for payment of attorney fees and costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/20/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
09/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/20/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/20/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/26/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/22/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal