judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-96-00346-CR
09-96-00346-CR
11/08/1996
appeal from granting of motion to suppress
The State of Texas
Jones, Anthony Lavelle
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/1997Mandate Issued
03/17/1997MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
01/31/1997Order EnteredDismissed
01/21/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/11/1996Response
12/02/1996Statement of Facts Filed
11/15/1996Transcript Filed
11/08/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/08/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jones, Anthony LavelleAppelleeJohn E. Sherman
Jones, Anthony LavelleCriminal - State of TexasWayln G. Thompson
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasTom Maness
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
68519