judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-1,588-17
WR-1,588-17
11/08/1996
1107-HC
GUAJARDO JR., GUADALUPE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/21/2000MISC DOCU RECD
05/21/1997ACTION TAKENFile and set
05/02/1997MISC DOCU RECD
04/14/1997MISC DOCU RECD
03/24/1997SUPP RECD
02/12/1997ORDER ISSUEDHC Remanded to trial court for evidentiary hearing
11/08/1996WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/21/1997STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GUAJARDO, JR.GUADALUPEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
79th District Court
Jim Wells
93-05-8331-A