judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOLDEN VS. STATE, DMV

Case Information: 33485
Short Caption:HOLDEN VS. STATE, DMVCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A372193Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from John G. Watkins, Esq.--check no. 3938.
12/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00412
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/04/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00004
01/26/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-00516
02/12/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants: 15 days to file a transcript /no transcript request; 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-01010
01/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix and either a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. Respondent shall, within 30 days of service of the opening biref, file and serve the answering brief. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-00336
01/24/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express Mail 1/22/00. Certificate of no transcript request included in Opening Brief. 00-01103
01/24/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (Called for a certificate of service.) 00-01104
01/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for Appellant's Appendix. 00-01288
02/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 24, 2000, appellant filed an opening brief and appendix, with a certificate of no transcript request included in the brief. We caution appellant's counsel, that in the future the court expects full compliance with its procedural rules and orders. Failure to comply may result in deficient documents being returned, unfiled. 00-01875
02/11/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 2/9/00. 00-02198
03/07/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 3/6/00. 00-03586
12/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . .we affirm the order of the district court denying judicial review." fn1[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 00-21572
01/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21788
01/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2001. 00-21788