judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEONARD SINGER v. NEW TECH ENGINEERING L.P., Individually and through Vicarious Liability for NEW TECH SAFETY LIMITED

Case Heading (S-09-0024)
Case Number:S-09-0024Case Docketed On:01/29/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:LEONARD SINGER v. NEW TECH ENGINEERING L.P., Individually and through Vicarious Liability for NEW TECH SAFETY LIMITED
Full Title:LEONARD SINGER, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. NEW TECH ENGINEERING L.P., Individually and through Vicarious Liability for NEW TECH SAFETY LIMITED, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLeonard SingerCody L. Balzer
Mark L. Carman
AppelleeNew Tech Engineering L.P.Roger E. Shumate
James Corey Worthen
AppelleeNew Tech Safety LimitedRoger E. Shumate
James Corey Worthen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Labor and Employment, Negligence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 31
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/29/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/29/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/17/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Leonard SingerEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/04/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record (improper caption)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/22/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Roger E. Shumate for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Leonard SingerEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mark Carman for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/03/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/18/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Mark L. Carman for appellant; Roger E. Shumate and James Corey Worthen, argument by Mr. Shumate for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/18/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/22/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/07/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/07/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/09/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/8/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal