judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1098
96-1098
11/08/1996
See former TRAP 130(D)
RODOLFO R. DIAZ
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/19/1997Motion for RehearingPetitionerenvelope attached to original
12/19/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/09/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
04/10/1997Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledrehearing overruled
03/19/1997Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
03/19/1997Motion for Rehearingenvelope attached to original
03/19/1997Motion for Rehearing forwardedrecord remains in clerk's office
03/19/1997Notice requesting filing feeMO/RE ($10.00); to David Martinez (check for $75.00 returned)
02/28/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDismissed for Want of Jurisdiction
01/08/1997Case forwarded to Court
12/19/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/18/1996APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDdue 12-06-96
11/18/1996Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedapp due 12-06-96
11/12/1996Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/08/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F2 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASRespondentHonorable Robert W. Kinkaid Jr.
Mr. Terry McEachern
DIAZ, RODOLFO R.PetitionerMr. David Martinez
Court of Appeals Information:
07-95-00290-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 07-31-96
7th Court of Appeals
Honorable CARLTON B. DODSON
Trial Court Information
242nd District Court
Hale
Honorable Marvin F. Marshall
B27,343-9403