judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01393-CR
01-96-01393-CR
11/07/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Nolasco, Jose
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/21/2000Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/21/2000Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/14/2000Petition for discretionary review due
09/29/2000Motion for Rehearing Due
09/14/2000Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/14/2000Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/05/2000Submitted
09/05/2000Submission
09/05/2000Submitted
08/10/2000Oral argument has been waived
06/12/2000Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
06/12/2000Case ready to be set
06/12/2000Extension to file brief disposed-brief hereGrant motion
06/12/2000Case ready to be set
05/30/2000Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/26/2000Brief Due
04/26/2000Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
04/26/2000Correspondence
04/23/2000Brief Due
03/24/2000Order enteredOtherwise disposed
12/23/1999Brief Due
11/24/1999Order enteredOtherwise disposed
06/19/1999Brief Due
05/20/1999Case reinstated
05/20/1999Order enteredOtherwise disposed
05/20/1999Case reinstated
05/12/1999Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law filed in trial court (Tex. R. Civ. P. 296)
03/11/1999Order enteredAbate case
03/11/1999Order enteredAbate case
01/28/1999Brief past due notice
11/12/1998Order entered
07/01/1998Submission
06/03/1997Statement of Facts Received
01/10/1997Brief due for retained counsel
12/19/1996Brief Due
11/19/1996Statement of facts filed
11/13/1996Transcript filed
11/12/1996Record due
11/07/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/26/1996Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21)
07/26/1996Notice of appeal filed
07/15/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/21/2000Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
District Clerk, District District clerkMarc Hamlin
NOLASCO, JOSECriminal - AppellantJohn Paul
Richard W.B. Davis
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasBill R. Turner
Douglas Howell, III
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
Honorable JOHN M. DELANEY
24195272
18 Yrs. TDC 1,000 Fine