judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1095
96-1095
11/08/1996
See former TRAP 130(D)
DENNIS GROSS and SAM MOORE
PRISCILLA INNES, individually and as representative of the estate of GEORGE JAMES INNES, JR., deceased, and as next friend of L.A.I. and K.A.I., minors, and RUTH INNES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/09/1997Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner"Outline for Oral Arguments" 8 poster board blow up's of ex. and bench copies
05/12/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)behalf of City of Garland, Atty Brad Neighbor, 1st Asst. City Atty, P.O. Box 4 69002, Garland, TX, 75046, 972/205-2380
02/19/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)on behalf of Texas City Attorney's Association, by Susan M. Horton, 1821 Rutherford Lane, Austin, TX 78754 512/719-6300
01/27/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedReceived (instead of filed)behalf of International Assoc. Of Fire Fighters,AFL-CIO by Atty Thomas A. Wool dy, 1125 15th St., N.W., Ste. 400, Wash., D.C., 20000 202/833-8855
12/31/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioneron behalf of Dennis Gross & Sam Moore
12/31/1996Reply to ResponseRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/20/2000Case Stored33-C-1
07/14/1998Order of the Court IssuedOrder withdrawn; petition improvidently granted.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
07/14/1998App Writ Err reinstated to docket for reconsiderationPursuant to withdrawal of Grant, the application is reinstated
07/14/1998Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDismissed for Want of JurisdictionApplication for writ of error is dismissed for want of jurisdiction
07/14/1998Opinion issuedPer Curiam Opinion 988 SW2d 727
07/14/1998Previous Order of the Court withdrawnOrder withdrawn; petition improvidently granted.Order of 06/12/97 granting app is withdrawn, as the app was improvidently granted. Per Curiam Opinion
01/16/1998Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedMotion to withdraw and to substitute counsel granted
12/29/1997Miscellaneous Motion"Agreed Motion to Withdraw & Substitute Counsel" Atty J.Tooley continues to represent Pet's;desires firm of McCauley (et al) to withdraw; Orig + 11
12/29/1997Notice requesting filing fee$10 fee for Motion from Atty Joe Tooley
12/29/1997Phone call from Clerk's Officeto Office of Atty Joe Tooley requesting additional copies of Motion
10/09/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
10/09/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
10/09/1997Exhibits in case/cause filed"Outline for Oral Arguments" 8 poster board blow up's of ex. and bench copies
10/09/1997Oral argument argued for petitioners by Joe C. Tooley for respondents by Stephen J. Gugenheim
06/12/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
06/12/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
06/12/1997Amount of time allotted for oral argument.20/20 minutes to argue
06/12/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedGranted on Pt. 1
06/12/1997Set for Submissionto be argued 9 October, 1997
06/12/1997Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
05/12/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedbehalf of City of Garland, Atty Brad Neighbor, 1st Asst. City Atty, P.O. Box 4 69002, Garland, TX, 75046, 972/205-2380
02/19/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedon behalf of Texas City Attorney's Association, by Susan M. Horton, 1821 Rutherford Lane, Austin, TX 78754 512/719-6300
01/27/1997Amicus Curiae Brief receivedbehalf of International Assoc. Of Fire Fighters,AFL-CIO by Atty Thomas A. Wool dy, 1125 15th St., N.W., Ste. 400, Wash., D.C., 20000 202/833-8855
01/02/1997Case forwarded to Court
12/31/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filedon behalf of Dennis Gross & Sam Moore
12/31/1996Reply to Response
11/14/1996APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDdue 11-25-96
11/14/1996Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedapp due 11-25-96
11/08/1996Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/20/2000Case StoredCase stored.33-C-1
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GROSS, DENNISPetitionerMr. Joe C. Tooley
K.A.I. (MINOR)RespondentMr. Stephen Jay Gugenheim
ESTATE OF GEORGE JAMES INNESRespondentMr. James E. Girards
Mr. Stephen Jay Gugenheim
INNES, PRISCILLARespondentMr. Stephen Jay Gugenheim
MOORE, SAMPetitioner
INNES, RUTHRespondentMr. Stephen Jay Gugenheim
L.A.I. (MINOR)RespondentMr. Stephen Jay Gugenheim
Court of Appeals Information:
05-96-00019-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
930 SW2d 237, 08-29-96
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable ED KINKEADE
Trial Court Information
68th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gary Hall
95-3844