judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-96-00348-CR
09-96-00348-CR
11/08/1996
Felony DWI
Lopez, Jr., Maximillian
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/1997Mandate Issued
08/11/1997MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
06/25/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/16/1997Submitted
05/16/1997Submission
04/14/1997Brief Filed
04/14/1997Case ready to be set
02/21/1997Brief Filed
12/23/1996Statement of Facts Filed
11/20/1996Transcript Filed
11/08/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/08/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/11/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lopez, Jr., MaximillianAppellantNick C.e. Lebleu
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasWayln G. Thompson
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
71278
6 years & $1,000 fine