judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-96-00349-CR
09-96-00349-CR
11/08/1996
Delivery of a Drug
Booker, Gloria Faye
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/27/1997Mandate Issued
10/27/1997MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
08/13/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/03/1997Submitted
07/03/1997Submission
06/16/1997Brief Filed
06/16/1997Case ready to be set
04/16/1997Brief Filed
04/15/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/14/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/14/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/11/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/13/1996Statement of Facts Filed
11/19/1996Transcript Filed
11/08/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/08/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/27/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Booker, Gloria FayeAppellantDouglas M. Barlow
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasWayln G. Thompson
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
71669
15 years