judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-96-00329-CV
12-96-00329-CV
11/08/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Oryx Energy Company
Zapata-Fender, L.L.P., et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/08/2001Exhibit return letter
07/11/2000
07/07/2000Mandate Issued
07/07/2000Case stored
04/12/2000Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/17/1999Order Entered
08/26/1999Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
07/13/1999Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/11/1999Order EnteredDismissed
05/24/1999Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/26/1999Order Entered
03/16/1999Mot for time to file response disposed
03/03/1999ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
01/27/1999petition for review filed
12/10/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/10/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/10/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/23/1998motion for rehearing filed
11/23/1998motion for rehearing filed
11/20/1998motion for rehearing filed
11/09/1998Letter from the Court
11/06/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/05/1998Exhibit(s) filed
03/05/1998Cite Letter Filed
03/05/1998Submitted
03/05/1998Order Entered
03/05/1998Submission
02/23/1998Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
02/09/1998Filing Fee Paid
02/06/1998letter filed
02/05/1998Cite Letter Filed
02/05/1998Order Entered
02/03/1998Reply Brief Filed
02/03/1998Reply Brief Recd
02/03/1998Response to Motion Filed
02/03/1998motion filed
01/26/1998Notice Filed
01/15/1998Submission
09/03/1997Prescreened
08/25/1997Brief Filed
08/25/1997Case ready to be set
08/13/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/28/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/28/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/15/1997Motion or Writ Granted
07/15/1997Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
07/15/1997Response to Motion Filed
07/02/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/26/1997motion to supplement record filed
06/20/1997supplemental transcript filed
06/20/1997Supplemental Transcript Received
06/16/1997Brief Filed
04/28/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/10/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/17/1997
02/20/1997Motion or Writ Granted
02/10/1997Filing Fee Paid
02/03/1997motion for extension of time to file sfacts
01/15/1997Filing Fee Paid
01/13/1997Filing Fee Not Paid
12/09/1996Motion or Writ Granted
11/27/1996motion for extension of time to file sfacts
11/14/1996Filing Fee Paid
11/13/1996letter filed
11/08/1996No Description Available.
11/08/1996No Description Available.
11/08/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/23/1996Surety Bond Filed
08/30/1996Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
08/02/1996Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/13/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Zapata-fender, L.l.p. L.l.p.AppelleeMr. Sam B. Cobb Jr.
Oryx Energy CompanyAppellantMr. Michael E. Gazette
Mr. J. Albert Kroemer
Thor Exploration, Inc.AppelleeMs. Deborah J. Race
Mr. Otis Carroll
Trial Court Information
241st District Court
Smith
Honorable Diane Vinson De Vasto
92/2854-A/E/C