judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01762-CV
05-96-01762-CV
11/08/1996
Miscellaneous civil
MDA/BAIN, L.P.
Meridian Land Company, Inc., George W. Doring, Carroll V. Sorelle
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/20/2017Order enteredDestroy
04/18/2017Letter issued by the court
12/11/1998Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
09/30/1998Mandate Issued
09/30/1998Mandate Issued
09/23/1998Record Returned
08/25/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/25/1998petition for review disposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/14/1997Record Shipped
05/08/199710.00 Fee Paid
05/07/1997Application for Writ of Error Filed
04/24/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/09/1997Motion to Show Authorities
04/07/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/03/1997Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
04/03/1997Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
04/02/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/24/1997Response to Motion
02/12/1997Brief Filed
02/12/1997Brief Received
02/12/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/06/1997Response to Motion
02/04/1997MattConv
01/30/1997MattConv
01/29/1997Supplemental Transcript filed
01/17/1997Response to Motion
01/10/1997Jurisdictional Brief Filed
01/10/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/09/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/03/1997Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
01/02/1997MattConv
01/02/1997Motion to Supplement Transcript
12/26/1996MattConv
12/20/1996Response to Motion
12/10/1996Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
12/10/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/10/1996Mot. Ext. time to File Juris Brief
12/07/1996Record due
12/06/199650.00 Filing Fee Due
11/26/1996MattConv
11/26/1996Motion to Consolidate Filed
11/20/1996Letter Sent by the Court
11/18/1996MattConv
11/08/1996Transcript Filed
11/08/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/08/1996Appeal Bond Filed
05/07/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
04/09/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/20/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mda/bain, L.p.AppellantJeffrey Robert Sandberg
John K. Popham
Meridian Land Company, Inc., GAppelleeRichard E. Schellhammer
Kenneth R. Aslakson
E. Eldridge Goins, Jr.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
95-01978-A