judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01360-CV
01-96-01360-CV
11/12/1996
Malpractice
Martin, Donald F. and Patty Martin indiv. anf of April Nicole Martin, A Minor
Alan Catterson MD, Caremark International Inc dba Kelsey-Seybold Clinic PA and Kelsey Seybold Clinic Medical Group
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/13/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/20/1999Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
06/10/1999Date Petition for Review Disposed in Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
06/10/1999Higher court decisionMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
12/23/1998Date final opinion release for publication
11/24/1998Correspondence
11/01/1998Case file received by higher Court or agency.
10/26/1998Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
10/23/1998$25.00 Express fee filed to send file to Austin
10/16/1998Request from Supreme Court to Forward Record / Petitioner requested to pay Shipping Fee
09/01/1998Correspondence
07/06/1998Date Petition for Review filed in Supeme Court
06/02/1998Extension of time to file Petition for Review disposed by Supreme Court.Grant motion
06/01/1998Extention of time to file Petition for Review filed.
04/16/1998Extension of time to file reply brief disposed.Grant motion
04/16/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/16/1998Supplemental brief filed
04/16/1998Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/23/1998Submitted
03/23/1998Submission
03/23/1998Submitted
02/25/1998Brief Received
02/25/1998Extension of time to file reply brief filed.
02/25/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
02/19/1998Motion to dismiss appeal disposedOverruled
02/06/1998Submission
01/29/1998Extension of time to file reply brief disposed.Grant motion
01/20/1998Extension of time to file reply brief filed.
01/20/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
12/22/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/22/1997Case ready to be set
12/22/1997Case ready to be set
12/21/1997Brief Due
12/05/1997Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
12/04/1997Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
12/04/1997Motion to dismiss
11/21/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/21/1997Correspondence
11/20/1997Brief Due
10/16/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
10/16/1997Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
06/20/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/20/1997No description available.
05/08/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/14/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/13/1997Brief Due
02/27/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/18/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/18/1997No description available.
02/16/1997Brief Due
01/02/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/12/1996Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/26/1996Filing Fee in the amount of $50 paid-trans filed
11/15/1996Record due
11/12/1996Transcript filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/16/1996Appeal bond filed
09/16/1996Date judgment signed by trial judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/13/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MARTIN, DONALD F. AND PATTY MAAppellantC. Denice Smith
Jeffery Taylor Nobles
MARTIN, DONALD F. AND PATTY MAAppelleeSolace H. Kirkland
ALAN CATTERSON MD, CAREMARK INAppelleeJeffrey B. McClure
Trial Court Information
152nd District Court
Harris
Honorable Harvey G. Brown
9410440