judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01372-CV
14-96-01372-CV
11/13/1996
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte Ed Falk
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/16/1996Opinion issuedDENIED
12/16/1996Opinion issuedDENIED
12/15/1996Submitted
12/15/1996Submission
12/15/1996Submitted
11/18/1996Respondent's Brief Due
11/18/1996Response brief FILED-ANT,APE
11/15/1996Misc Motion filed
11/14/1996Court's request for a response
11/13/1996Petition for writ of habeas corpus FILED-REL,RES
11/13/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/16/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ED FALK, EX PARTERelatorJames Sean Healey
IN INTEREST, REAL PARTIESRespondentJeffrey A. Lehmann
Trial Court Information
11th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 11th District Court
95-41430