judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1117
96-1117
11/13/1996
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
TED RADCLIFFE
THE HONORABLE JACK PIERCE JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/28/1997Case Stored
11/26/1996M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledmandamus overruled
11/21/1996Letter Filedto remove Tim James from service list, and to add Rob Atherton in his place
11/13/1996Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court CostsO + 4
11/13/1996Exhibits receivedOriginal only
11/13/1996Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusO + 4
11/13/1996Petition for writ receivedO + 4
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/28/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WALTON, JOHN A.RespondentMr. Robert B. Atherton
RADCLIFFE, TEDRelatorMr. Ted Radcliffe
Court of Appeals Information:
12-96-00245-CV
M/L/F Overuled
ORDER, 08-19-96
12th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information