judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01368-CR
01-96-01368-CR
11/12/1996
Other Felony
Thompson, Larry Eugene
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/24/1998Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/24/1998Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/26/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/26/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/09/1998Submitted
02/09/1998Submission
02/09/1998Submitted
01/08/1998Submission
10/30/1997Brief Due
10/29/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/29/1997Case ready to be set
10/29/1997Case ready to be set
09/30/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
09/30/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/22/1997Brief received only-oral argument requested
09/12/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/07/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/31/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/19/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/02/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/17/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/07/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/03/1997Brief Due
03/06/1997Statement of Facts Due
03/04/1997Statement of facts filed
01/30/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
01/08/1997Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
01/06/1997Record due
01/06/1997Transcript filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/07/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
11/07/1996Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/24/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THOMPSON, LARRY EUGENECriminal - AppellantJames R. Reed
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasBarbara Ann Drumheller
John B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
Honorable JEANNINE BARR
698156
40 Yrs. TDC