judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-96-00251-CR
10-96-00251-CR
11/13/1996
Possession of Cocaine
Margaret Wigfall Olds
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/06/1998Case stored
10/06/1998Mandate issued by this Court
09/21/1998Case returned from higher court
09/16/1998Motion for Rehearing filedMotion or Writ Denied
06/22/1998Motion for Rehearing filed
06/03/1998Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
04/22/1998Case forwarded to higher court
04/14/1998Petition for Discretionary Review filed
03/11/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/17/1997Submitted
12/17/1997Submission
11/26/1997Submission
11/14/1997Brief filed, oral argument not requested
11/12/1997Case ready to be set
10/15/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/10/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief
09/17/1997Motion for extension of time to file briefMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief
08/13/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/11/1997No Description Available.
08/08/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
08/06/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/30/1997No Description Available.
07/16/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/16/1997Motion to substitute attorneyMotion or Writ Granted
07/11/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
07/11/1997Motion to substitute attorney
06/18/1997Motion for Leave to File.Motion or Writ Granted
06/11/1997Brief filed, oral argument requested
06/11/1997Motion for Leave to File.
05/15/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/12/1997No Description Available.
05/12/1997No Description Available.
05/08/1997No Description Available.
03/12/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/06/1997No Description Available.
01/08/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/07/1997No Description Available.
12/12/1996No Description Available.
12/11/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/06/1996No Description Available.
12/04/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/02/1996No Description Available.
11/21/1996No Description Available.
11/13/1996Notice of Appeal filed
11/13/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/06/2023Case StoredDestroy case in 25 years.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasRay Montgomery
Gina M. Debottis
Olds, Margaret WigfallAppellantSteven C. Bankhead
Trial Court Information
12th District Court
Leon
8021-B
10 yrs tdc