judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01372-CR
01-96-01372-CR
11/12/1996
Habeas Corpus
Vogeley, Michael John
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/21/2000Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/21/2000Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/07/1999Mandate due to be issued
10/07/1999Opinion issuedDismissed
10/07/1999Opinion issuedDismissed
10/06/1999Submitted
10/06/1999Submission
10/06/1999Submitted
05/06/1998Reporter's Record Past Due Notice sent
12/09/1996Past Due Notice No Statement of Facts
12/07/1996Record due
12/06/1996Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/21/1996Transcript filed
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/07/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
11/07/1996Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/21/2000Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
REPORTER, COURTCourt reporterJanet Ragan
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
VOGELEY, MICHAEL JOHNCriminal - AppellantWilliam T. Cornelius
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 6
Harris
Honorable JACK ROBERT MUSSLEWHITE
9647979