judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01767-CR
05-96-01767-CR
11/13/1996
Felony DWI
VANCE, RHONDA
TEXAS, THE STATE OF
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/03/1998Mandate Issued
08/03/1998Mandate Issued
05/15/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/15/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/31/1998Submitted
03/31/1998Submission
03/31/1998Submitted
02/25/1998Letter Filed
02/06/1998Submission
07/22/1997Brief Filed
07/22/1997Case ready to be set
07/22/1997Case ready to be set
07/21/1997MattConv
04/24/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/22/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/21/1997MattConv
03/30/1997MattConv
03/27/1997Brief Filed
02/28/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/26/1997Record due
12/10/1996Letter Filed
11/21/1996Transcript Filed
11/14/1996Notice Sent
11/13/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/30/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/29/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
10/24/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/03/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasMitchell R. Nolte
Vance, RhondaCriminal - AppellantW. Mark Montgomery
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Collin
Honorable Jerry C. Lewis
2-82139-95
365 DYS/2000 FINE