judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01391-CV
14-96-01391-CV
11/13/1996
Contract
Johnson, Lonnie L. and Johnson, Eartha Jean
Perry Homes, a Joint Venture
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/11/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/15/1999Case stored
03/10/1999Mandate due to be issued
03/10/1999Mandate Issued
03/10/1999Mandate Issued
02/15/1999No Pettition for Review FILED
02/15/1999Petition for Review DUE
12/30/1998Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
11/13/1998Motion for rehearing DUE
11/13/1998Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
10/29/1998Opinion issuedAFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED AND REMANDED IN PART
10/29/1998Opinion issuedAFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED AND REMANDED IN PART
01/29/1998Submitted
01/29/1998Submission
01/29/1998Submitted
01/21/1998Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA
12/19/1997Submission
09/30/1997Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA
06/09/1997No description available.
06/09/1997Supplemental transcript DUE
05/22/1997Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
05/08/1997Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
02/21/1997Appellee's brief DUE
02/21/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/24/1997Supplemental transcript DUE
01/14/1997No description available.
01/09/1997Amended motion DISPOSEDGRANTED
01/09/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/07/1997Appellee's brief DUE
01/02/1997Amended motion FILED - ANT,APE,APP,REL,RES,STA
01/02/1997Amended motion FILED - ANT,APE,APP,REL,RES,STA
12/27/1996Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/27/1996Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
12/13/1996Appellant's brief DUE
12/13/1996Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/13/1996Case ready to be set
12/13/1996Case ready to be set
11/18/1996Record due
11/13/1996Transcript FILED
11/13/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/14/1996Bond FILED
07/19/1996Judgment signed by trial court judge
06/10/1996Motion for new trial FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/16/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
JOHNSON, LONNIE L. AND JOHNSONAppellantLonnie L. Johnson
PERRY HOMES, A JOINT VENTUREAppelleeAndrew E. Rubenstein
Daniel F. Shank
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
Honorable RUSSELL T. LLOYD
94-53854