judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUNDLEY (OSCAR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33480
Short Caption:HUNDLEY (OSCAR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C139680Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/17/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00406
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33262, 33289, 33318, 33402, 33463, 33464, 33465, 33479, 33480, 33481, 33523. 99-00323
05/17/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 5/14/99. 99-03986
05/17/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Upon completion of the transcript, the clerk of the district court shall within 10 days transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. 00-19317
12/01/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/8/97. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 00-21032
12/07/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/8/97. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. (Transcript submitted by Clark County District Court Clerk in lieu of Supplement Record on Appeal). 00-21436
01/23/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-01477
02/21/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-01514
02/21/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2001. 01-01514