judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONA M. ELLIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1487
Short Caption:RONA M. ELLIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-5784-10Filed Date:11/26/2010

Opening Event Date:11/26/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/31/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRona M. Ellis Y
Erek L. BarronYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Andrea L. Hertzfeld YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/26/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/08/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Erek Barron, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/08/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Erek Barron, Esquire
12/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (177 pgs/McCarn) 8/19/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (406 pgs/Kaczorowski) 8/23-25/10 proc. w/cd
03/07/2011RECORD INDEX
03/07/2011RECORD COPIES
03/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/26/2011APPENDIX
05/18/2011APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEFno oppo
05/18/2011RECEIVED - aplt's corrected brief.
05/31/2011ORD GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL AMENDED/CORRECTED BRF (Castillo)
05/31/2011APPELLANT'S AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
05/31/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/31/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/22/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
06/27/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
06/28/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/12/2012FiledArgued before Judges Thompson, Oberly, King
02/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
03/07/2012FiledMandate
04/24/2012FiledNotice Received - SUGGESTION OF DEATH (Appellant)