judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-96-00335-CR
12-96-00335-CR
11/13/1996
Robbery
Brumley, Clifton Loyd
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/02/1999
01/28/1999Mandate Issued
01/28/1999Case stored
01/12/1999Case Returned from Higher Ct.
01/04/1999Higher Court DecisionRefused
12/16/1998Higher Court DecisionRefused
10/19/1998ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
09/25/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
09/14/1998Motion for rehearing was not filed
08/28/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/18/1998Submitted
06/18/1998Submission
05/18/1998Letter to Submit w/o Argument
05/18/1998Submission
01/02/1998Prescreened
12/31/1997Brief Filed
12/31/1997Case ready to be set
12/30/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/09/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/13/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/10/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/08/1997Brief Filed
10/08/1997Brief Received
09/25/1997Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ No Action Taken
09/25/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/12/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/12/1997motion filed
08/26/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/11/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/15/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/08/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/10/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/02/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/19/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/07/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/09/1997Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
04/09/1997Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/19/1997letter filed
03/05/1997letter received
02/21/1997Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion passed
02/05/1997motion filed
02/05/1997No Description Available.
01/28/1997Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
01/28/1997motion received, but not filed
01/13/1997Letter from the Court
01/10/1997motion filed
12/31/1996
12/31/1996
12/30/1996
12/30/1996
12/30/1996affidavit filed
12/27/1996No Description Available.
12/27/1996No Description Available.
11/13/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/25/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/24/1996Date Sentence Given in Open Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/28/1999RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
01/28/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brumley, Clifton LoydAppellantMr. E. Carl Moore
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMr. Edward J. Marty
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
Smith
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
F-96-688-7/4
90 yrs TDCJ-ID