judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1113
96-1113
11/13/1996
App Writ of Error
H. SCOTT BORLAND
ERNEST A. EMERSON QUAY WOOD BRIAN McRAE GLENN ZOCH and LOUIS diDONATO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/18/1996Reply BriefRespondentBrief of Appelants
11/18/1996Reply to ResponseRespondent"Appellant's Reply BRief"
11/13/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/18/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
01/31/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
11/20/1996Case forwarded to Court
11/18/1996Reply BriefBrief of Appelants
11/18/1996Reply to Response"Appellant's Reply BRief"
11/13/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/18/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F3 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
EMERSON, ERNEST A.RespondentMr. Leo L. Barnes
Mr. Jose Manuel Rangel
Mr. James C. Todd
ZOCH, GLENNRespondentMr. James C. Todd
DIDONATO, LOUISRespondentMr. James C. Todd
MCRAE, BRIANRespondentMr. James C. Todd
BORLAND, H. SCOTTPetitionerMr. Scott Ozmun
Mr. Jerry Galow
WOOD, QUAYRespondentMr. James C. Todd
EMERSON, ERNEST A. ET AL.RespondentMr. Dan Morales
Court of Appeals Information:
03-95-00023-CV
Reversed & Rendered
927 SW2d 709, 07-17-96
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable J. WOODFIN JONES
Trial Court Information
53rd District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
435,470