judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY v. FIRST SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF BURKBURNETT, TEXAS

Case: B-1275
B-1275
01/02/1969
Application for Writ of Error
AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY
FIRST SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF BURKBURNETT, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/26/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/14/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/13/1969Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/02/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/26/1969Response to Motion filed
02/26/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/14/1969Response to Petition
01/13/1969Response to Petition
01/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/02/1969Conditional application for writ of error filed
01/02/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/02/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANYPetitioner
First Savings and Loan Association of Burkburnett, TexasRespondent
Atlantic Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information