judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THAMAR (SAID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33479
Short Caption:THAMAR (SAID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C112436Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/24/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00404
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33262, 33289, 33318, 33402, 33463, 33464, 33465, 33479, 33480, 33481, 33523. 99-00322
05/24/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 7. Mailed on 5/19/99. 99-04246
05/24/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17356
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17455
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-17455