judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JESSE THOMAS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0018)
Case Number:S-09-0018Case Docketed On:01/23/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JESSE THOMAS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JESSE THOMAS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJesse ThomasDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing, Evidence, Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 92
Citation:211 P.3d 509

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/23/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/12/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/12/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/18/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume III, Transcript; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Confidential Folder; Volume VI, Original Supreme Court Record for 06-266 (two volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/02/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
07/15/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/31/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/31/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/04/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal