judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-96-00920-CV
04-96-00920-CV
11/13/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Hudson Dobson, Individually; Libby Dobson, Individually; And Elite Games Group, Inc.
Michael Poor, Individually And As A Shareholder Of Global Games, Inc.; Liams, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/03/1998Original Exhibits Returned
09/03/1998Mandate Issued
09/03/1998Mandate Issued
06/10/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered/Reversed & Remanded
06/10/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered/Reversed & Remanded
12/03/1997Submitted
12/03/1997Submission
12/03/1997Submitted
11/26/1997Reply brief filed
11/04/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
10/30/1997Submission
07/02/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
07/02/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
07/02/1997Order Entered
07/02/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
07/02/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/30/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
06/24/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/17/1997Amended Brief Filed
06/17/1997Requests Oral Argument
06/17/1997Amended Brief Received
06/17/1997Motion for Leave Filed
06/17/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
06/17/1997Motion Filed
06/17/1997Verification Filed
06/13/1997Motion filed without verification
06/11/1997Brief Filed
06/11/1997Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
06/11/1997Case ready to be set
06/11/1997Requests Oral Argument
06/11/1997Case ready to be set
06/10/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/09/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
06/09/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/27/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/12/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
05/12/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/01/1997Brief Filed
05/01/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
05/01/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
05/01/1997Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
05/01/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/01/1997Requests Oral Argument
04/18/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
04/18/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/09/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
04/09/1997Response to Motion Filed
04/07/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/24/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/24/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Denied
03/24/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Denied
03/24/1997Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/13/1997Motion for Leave Filed
03/13/1997Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/12/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/12/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/12/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/12/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
03/12/1997Information regarding cause received
02/13/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/13/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
02/13/1997No Description Available.
02/06/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/27/1997Response to Motion Filed
01/27/1997Verification Filed
01/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/21/1997Motion Filed
01/21/1997Continuation of Information from previous eventMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/13/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/13/1997Response to Motion Filed
01/07/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/07/1997No Description Available.
11/27/1996No Description Available.
11/27/1996No Description Available.
11/25/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/13/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/13/1996No Description Available.
11/13/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/12/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/12/1996No Description Available.
11/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/12/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
11/12/1996Exhibits Filed
10/28/1996Appeal Bond Filed
10/28/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
10/10/1996Appeal Bond Filed
08/29/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
07/31/1996Continuation of Information from previous event
07/31/1996Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/01/2004RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
09/03/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Michael Poor, Ind. Et Al.AppelleeRobert P. Wilson
Hudson Dodson, Ind. Et Al.AppellantShari P. Pulman
Joel H. Pullen
Trial Court Information
131st Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Charles A Gonzalez
93-CI-14990
n/a